This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 00:29:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. BRITTNEY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRITTNEY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BRITTNEY JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN GREEN

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/01/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

04/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

03/30/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/11/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

03/05/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/11/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/06/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/30/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/17/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/15/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/15/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

01/15/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: without prejudice by Midland Funding LLC Instrument: 2020097020 Book: 7858 Page: 992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 5/11/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 6/4/2020 at 01:30p in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 4/7/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 5/11/2020 at 09:00a in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: Alias To BRITTNEY JOHNSON fwd to pltfs atty & proc serv(Max) via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: as to Brittney Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Brittney Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To BRITTNEY JOHNSON fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Brittney Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Funding LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less