This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 02:17:21 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC V. BRANDON STEWART

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against BRANDON STEWART. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BRANDON STEWART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALERIA OBI

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

09/12/2020 : DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

09/11/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

09/11/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

09/11/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

DEFAULT

08/19/2020 : DEFAULT

HEARING SHEET

08/18/2020 : HEARING SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/11/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

07/24/2020 : NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

05/26/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

04/29/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

03/19/2020 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/06/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/21/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/17/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/14/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/14/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/14/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: agst Brandon Stewart for $3,199.48 Instrument: 2020174801 Book: 7911 Page: 2416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Brandon Stewart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE; Description: by Joan Hennen obo Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: by Payal Chatani,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Brandon Stewart by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: DFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of mailing amended pre-trial conference via zoom to Brandon Stewart by Midland Credit Managment Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: (Amd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Brandon Stewart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To BRANDON STEWART fwd to pltfs atty & proc serv(Max) via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Brandon Stewart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Credit management Inc w/no prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less