This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/14/2023 at 02:18:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC V. ANGEL PABON CASILLAS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGEL PABON CASILLAS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

ANGEL PABON CASILLAS

Deltona, FL 32738-6820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAL CHATANI

P O Box 2121

Warren, MI 48090-2121

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/03/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/03/2023 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/03/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/03/2023 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/05/2023 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/16/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Angel Pabon Casillas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To ANGEL PABON CASILLAS rtn to atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Credit Mgmt Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Angel Pabon Casillas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less