This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/20/2022 at 20:55:38 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK V. JEFF RAYMOND BLOW, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JEFF RAYMOND BLOW. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIDFIRST BANK

ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendants

JEFF RAYMOND BLOW

Debary, FL 32713

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JEFF RAYMOND BLOW

Debary, FL 32713

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Debary, FL 32713

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Debary, FL 32713

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZACHARY Y ULLMAN

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/10/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/10/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DEFAULT

01/26/2022 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

01/24/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

01/24/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

01/13/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

01/12/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/12/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/12/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/17/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

WORKSHEET

12/17/2021 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/17/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

12/17/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Midfirst Bank Instrument: 2022059842 Book: 8219 Page: 2174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Jeff Raymond Blow and Unk tenant #1 nka David Flugel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Jeff Raymond Blow & Unkn Tenant #1 nka David Flugel w/prop default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: Unkn Spouse of Jeff Raymond Blow & Unkn Tenant #2 Instrument: 2022020084 Book: 8193 Page: 3748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Spouse of Jeff Raymond Blow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Unknown Tenant #1 nka David Flugel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Jeff Raymond Blow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By Midfirst Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: By Zachary Ullman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Spouse Of Jeff Raymond Blow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Jeff Raymond Blow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021302342 Book: 8173 Page: 4428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.