This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/15/2022 at 16:57:25 (UTC).

MICHAELA ROBERTS V. JOSE ANTONIO ACOSTA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 MICHAELA ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ANTONIO ACOSTA. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAELA ROBERTS

MORGAN & MORGAN P A

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

JOSE ANTONIO ACOSTA

Saint Cloud, FL 34771

HAWK LOGISTICS LLC

Raleigh, NC 27601

NEXTRAN CORPORATION D B A NEXTRAN RENTAL & LEASING

Jacksonville, FL 32202

NEXTRAN RENTAL & LEASING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTINA G ARGUELLES

570 Crown Oak Centre Drive

Longwood, FL 32750

MARY K MORAN

20 N. Orange Avenue, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL KRAFT

201 E Kennedy Blvd, Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

08/24/2022 : OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

08/15/2022 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/25/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/25/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/21/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/21/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

07/15/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

07/14/2022 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/13/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/19/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/19/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

04/19/2022 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/19/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32); Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Michaela Roberts to ntc of production from non parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Advanced Diagnostic Group et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by Michaela Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Michaela Roberts to req to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Hawk Logistics LLC to pltfs req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Hawk Logistics LLC w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: KWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Nextran Corps mtn to dismiss and/or for more definite statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: (joint stip) Nextran Corp etc Instrument: 2022168480 Book: 8285 Page: 1981 View: 2022168480

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Jose Antonio Acosta et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Michael Kraft Esq obo Hawk Logistics LLC & designation of email

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JOSE ANTONIO ACOSTA forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Jose Antonio Acosta, Hawk Logistics, LLC and Nextran Corporation d/b/a Nextran Rental & Leasing by Michaela Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Jose Antonio Acosta, Hawk Logistics, LLC and Nextran Corporation d/b/a Nextran Rental & Leasing by Michaela Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Jose Antonio Acosta by Michaela Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Nextran Corporation d/b/a Nextran Rental & Leasing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Hawk Logistics, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Jose Acosta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Christina G Arguelles, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXTRAN RENTAL & LEASING is a litigant

Latest cases where NEXTRAN CORP 15666 is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN & MORGAN PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAFT, MICHAEL