Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/09/2020 at 11:51:20 (UTC).

MICHAEL MCLAREN, ET AL V. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 MICHAEL MCLAREN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID LOW & ASSOCIATES PA

PEGGY MCLAREN

MICHAEL MCLAREN

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID LOW

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

CASSANDRE D ANGLADE

2101 West Commercial Boulevard Suite 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

CRISTINA P CAMBO

Attorney at BOLIN LAW GROUP P A

1905 E 7Th Avenue

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/30/2020 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/27/2020 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

10/23/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

06/23/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

05/22/2020 : MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/12/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/08/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

05/07/2020 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/05/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/05/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/23/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/18/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/18/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/18/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

12/23/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/09/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/09/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Dfnt's Corp Rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: to United Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of atty w/in firm to Cassandre D Anglade Esq obo Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: by Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Michael Mclaren and Peggy Mclaren to first request for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Verified answers to interrogs by Michael Mclaren and Peggy Mclaren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: & obj to pltf's ntc of taking depo of dfnt's corp representative by United Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (amended)of Sue Crotty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Corp Rep

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo United Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (1st) to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Michael McLaren et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to United Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cassandre D Anglade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, David, ESQ.