Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/04/2020 at 11:01:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL COMPTON MILLS V. AIMEE ALEXANDRA MORGAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 MICHAEL COMPTON MILLS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AIMEE ALEXANDRA MORGAN. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL COMPTON MILLS

Respondent

AIMEE ALEXANDRA MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: 0 copies/ 2 envs Instrument: 2020039657 Book: 7819 Page: 2863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: REPORT OF FINDINGS OF GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: WAIVER BY/FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: CI309, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: pet **not notarized**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE; Description: w/Mandatory Disclosure Michael Compton Mills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Aimee Alexandra Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Michael Compton Mills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Aimee Alexandra Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Michael Compton Mills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Description: Kathy Andeson obo Michael Compton Mills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: ANSWER AND WAIVER; Description: Aimee Alexandra Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less