This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/14/2022 at 17:34:52 (UTC).

MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC A A O GASPAR LABRADA V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC A A O GASPAR LABRADA filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC A A O GASPAR LABRADA

GASPAR LABRADA

CAVADA LAW FIRM P A

Doral, FL 33126

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEREK CAVADA

Attorney at THE CAVADA LAW FIRM

7875 Nw 12Th Street Ste 113

Doral, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/17/2021 : COMPLAINT

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/01/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/07/2021 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/25/2021 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Memorial Medical Center Inc.,etc Instrument: 2021256445 Book: 8143 Page: 814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Memorial Medical Center Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVADA LAW FIRM P A is a litigant

Latest cases where Memorial Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cavada, Derek L, ESQ