This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/19/2020 at 14:40:45 (UTC).

MELISSA DIAN KLOCINSKI V. EVAN DANIEL KLOCINSKI

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 MELISSA DIAN KLOCINSKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EVAN DANIEL KLOCINSKI. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELISSA DIAN KLOCINSKI

Respondent

EVAN DANIEL KLOCINSKI

Not Classified By Court

MELISSA DIAN PENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAM R ALEXANDER

333 E New York Ave Suite A

Deland, FL 32724

Respondent Attorney

GIOVANNI OSUNA

725 West Granada Boulevard Suite 12

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: courtcall/zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att' consent order incorporating mediation agreement ** 0 copies / 0 envs** Instrument: 2020175219 Book: 7911 Page: 3562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: AGREEMENT MARITAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT; Description: the parties reached an agreement as reflected in the mediation agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: AGREEMENT; Description: mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT; Description: the parties reached an agreement as reflected in the mediation agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: att'd cert of course completion by resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT; Description: the parties reached an agreement as refected in the mediation agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE COMPLETION PARENTING CLASS; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to atty Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: DL by pet *atch*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: pet **incomplete, nothing in line 2, letter sent**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSUNA GIOVANNI