Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 13:17:24 (UTC).

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O JAZZMICK BAILEY V. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O JAZZMICK BAILEY filed an Other lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

JAZZMICK BAILEY

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O JAZZMICK BAILEY

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at KIMBERLY P SIMOES P A

910 Sw 1St Ave Suite 200

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

03/08/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR. PHILLIPS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY P SIMOES