Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/03/2021 at 13:18:49 (UTC).

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O DIERRA WALLACE V. CENTURY NATIONAL COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O DIERRA WALLACE filed an Other lawsuit against CENTURY NATIONAL COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR PHILLIPS L L C A A O DIERRA WALLACE

DIERRA WALLACE

Defendant

CENTURY NATIONAL COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Suite 201

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/17/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/04/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

03/04/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/04/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To CENTURY-NATIONAL COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty by eservice for sop, cc pltf's atty by eservice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Century Nat'l Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC DR. PHILLIPS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY P SIMOES