This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/20/2022 at 15:51:20 (UTC).

MATTHEW JORDAN V. LOGAN KIRK DIZZINI

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 MATTHEW JORDAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOGAN KIRK DIZZINI. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW JORDAN

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant

LOGAN KIRK DIZZINI

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION SHEET

12/01/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/01/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

NOTICE AUTHORIZING

12/01/2022 : NOTICE AUTHORIZING

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/01/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/01/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY

12/01/2022 : CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/01/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/07/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

12/12/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

12/12/2022 : DEFAULT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

12/12/2022 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

12/15/2022 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/16/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

12/16/2022 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: iss'd & fwd to VSO w/ indigency for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: Unlawful Detainer agst Logan "Kirk" Dizzini $243.50 (CC to be paid directly to Clerk)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Matthew Jordan w/ corrected address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Logan "Kirk" Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Logan "Kirk" Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Logan Kirk Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Logan "Kirk" Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: to LOGAN "KIRK" DIZZINI fwd to VSO w/cc cert of indigency for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Logan "Kirk" Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: of Matthew Jordan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Matthew Jordan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Logan "Kirk" Dizzini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE AUTHORIZING; Description: Matthew Jordan by Gloria Efird

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: unlawful detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less