This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/23/2022 at 02:00:55 (UTC).

MARGARET T FLANAGAN, ETC. V. HEATHER ETTA JACOBY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 MARGARET T FLANAGAN, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEATHER ETTA JACOBY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn Weston and Sandra C. Upchurch. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Kathryn Weston

Sandra C. Upchurch

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & KELTON P A

Deland, FL 32724

MARGARET T FLANAGAN

Defendant

HEATHER ETTA JACOBY

Indianapolis, IN 46237-9546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARLAN L PAUL

Attorney at PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & KELTON P A

142 E New York Ave

Deland, FL 32724-5504

 

Court Documents

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/12/2018 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

09/26/2017 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

DEFAULT

03/15/2018 : DEFAULT

MOTION RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

11/15/2017 : MOTION RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/10/2018 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/23/2018 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF FILING

09/27/2017 : NOTICE OF FILING

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

01/03/2018 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

CERTIFICATE FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

07/30/2018 : CERTIFICATE FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: Instrument: 2018153308 Book: 7577 Page: 4595

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Description: Instrument: 2018153307 Book: 7577 Page: 4593

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 70.00; Final Amount: 70.00; Credits: -70.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 70.00; Final Amount: 70.00; Credits: -70.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 28.70; Final Amount: 28.70; Credits: -28.70; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF/FOR SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: FACT SHEET / REAL PROPERTY SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR SALE; Description: 7/17/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Sandra C. Upchurch; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Pltf's Mtn for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Heather Etta Jacoby

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Heather Etta Jacoby by Margaret Flanagan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Harlan L Paul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; Description: by Harlan L Paul Esquire

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: by Harlan L Paul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE; Description: by Margaret T Flangan etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2017188324 Book: 7452 Page: 4101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL HARLAN L