This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 06:46:13 (UTC).

M & I GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC AAO FRANK FIORITI, ETC. V. TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 M I GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC AAO FRANK FIORITI, ETC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANK FIORITI

BOLTZ LEGAL

M & I GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC AAO FRANK FIORITI

Defendant

TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROOKE L BOLTZ

Boltz Legal Po Box 620578

Oviedo, FL 32762

Defendant Attorney

GENEVIEVE B VASATKA

Attorney at GRIEKKE & SALMON PA

485 N Keller Rd Ste 151

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/16/2019 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/16/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/16/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/16/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/16/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/16/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/18/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/03/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

10/14/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

10/14/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/07/2019 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/27/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by M&I General Contracting LLC aao Frank Fiorti Instrument: 2019256690 Book: 7795 Page: 2939

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Tower Hill Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: (amd) to respond to discovery & complaint by Tower Hill Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to Pltf's discovery by Towner Hill Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Genevieve B Vasatka Esq obo Tower Hill Select Insurance Company & designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Brooke Boltz, Esquire

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (First) to Tower Hill Select Insurance Company by M & I General Contracting LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Tower Hill Select Insurance Company by M & I General Contracting LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Tower Hill Select Insurance Company by M & I General Contracting LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Tower Hill Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M & I GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC AAO FRANK FIORITI is a litigant

Latest cases where BOLTZ LEGAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Tower Hill Select Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENEVIEVE VASATKA