This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/15/2020 at 00:16:11 (UTC).

LYON HOME ENTERPRISES LLC A A O INEZ PLOWDEN V. TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2020 LYON HOME ENTERPRISES LLC A A O INEZ PLOWDEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LYON HOME ENTERPRISES LLC A A O INEZ PLOWDEN

INEZ PLOWDEN

TAITT LAW P A

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINSTON A TAITT

Attorney at TAITT LAW P A

424 East Central Blvd #356

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL

10/21/2020 : MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL

ORDER TO VACATE / VACATING

10/22/2020 : ORDER TO VACATE / VACATING

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

10/21/2020 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

HEARING SHEET

10/21/2020 : HEARING SHEET

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/18/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2020 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/13/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/13/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/13/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/13/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

09/13/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER TO VACATE / VACATING; Description: Dismissal entered by October 21, 2020 Instrument: 2020204254 Book: 7931 Page: 959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CKZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12.5) Docket Type: MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL; Description: by Lyon Home Enterprises LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: Instrument: 2020204251 Book: 7931 Page: 954

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Winston A Taitt Esquire obo Lyon Home Enterprises LLC Etc w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company by Lyon Home Enterprises LLC Etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company by Lyon Home Enterprises LLC Etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company by Lyon Home Enterprises LLC Etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less