This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/18/2020 at 01:32:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. VERA BYE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERA BYE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant

VERA BYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/16/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

03/13/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

01/21/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

COURT NOTES

01/21/2020 : COURT NOTES

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

01/09/2020 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/08/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/31/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/20/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/20/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/20/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: status conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by LVNV Funding LLC Instrument: 2020055351 Book: 7829 Page: 4081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Vera Bye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To VERA BYE fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Vera Bye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less