Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/21/2021 at 01:58:47 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. PERNELL J BOBONICK

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERNELL J BOBONICK. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PERNELL J BOBONICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY L MOORE

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/21/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/18/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/18/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

03/18/2021 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PERNELL J BOBONICK fwd to pltfs atty/proc server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Pernell J Bobonick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L