This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/18/2022 at 05:40:34 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. LORI JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LORI JOHNSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant

LORI JOHNSON

Deland, FL 32724-3064

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/26/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/26/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/02/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/02/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

COURT NOTES

12/08/2022 : COURT NOTES

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

12/08/2022 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

12/08/2022 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2022276258 Book: 8346 Page: 728 View: 2022276258

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Lori Johnson Instrument: 2022276253 Book: 8346 Page: 697 View: 2022276253

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Lori Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To LORI JOHNSON fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Lori Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM