Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/26/2020 at 03:33:43 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. ISRAEL NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISRAEL NAVARRO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant

ISRAEL NAVARRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

03/19/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/19/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE

03/11/2020 : ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

03/10/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/10/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE

03/03/2020 : MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE

ORDER GRANTING

02/13/2020 : ORDER GRANTING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/10/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

01/13/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

01/09/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

COURT NOTES

01/09/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/30/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/04/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/22/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/20/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/20/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020058804 Book: 7831 Page: 4063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: to adopt stip and dismiss by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Israel Navarro Instrument: 2020049901 Book: 7826 Page: 1828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: LVNV Funding LLC of Trial memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY TELEPHONE; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: LVNV Funding LLC's mtn to allow absence of corp rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: LVNV Funding LLC to allow absence of pltf's representative from mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: by County Court Mediation Services

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: non jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Israel Navarro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To ISRAEL NAVARRO Fwd to Process Server/MAX in office for sop, cc pltfs atty via eservice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Israel Navarro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM