This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 00:45:36 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. GERALD J QUERCIOLI

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GERALD J QUERCIOLI. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant

GERALD J QUERCIOLI

Ormond Beach, FL 32176-7876

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/09/2023 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/09/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/13/2023 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/23/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Gerald J Quercioli

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GERALD J QUERCIOLI rtn to Pltf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Gerald J Querciolo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less