Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/05/2020 at 07:51:29 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. ELIZABETH BECK

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIZABETH BECK. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant

ELIZABETH BECK

Deland, FL 32724-8860

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

07/31/2020 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

07/17/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

07/17/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

07/13/2020 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

07/09/2020 : COURT NOTES

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

06/25/2020 : NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

05/05/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

04/03/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

03/23/2020 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/17/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/07/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/04/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/31/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/31/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: agst Elizabeth Beck,$1922.70 Instrument: 2020141397 Book: 7888 Page: 1591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Elizabeth Beck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: by judge as to Elizabeth Beck for FTA @ PT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: amd via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: amd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: PTC *2nd Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: per order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: & reset 4/2/2020 pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Elizabeth Beck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To ELIZABETH BECK fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Elizabeth Beck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM