Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:17:43 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. DANIEL KREITLER

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL KREITLER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant

DANIEL KREITLER

Port Orange, FL 32129-7428

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

HAROLD E SCHERR

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

05/21/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/20/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

04/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

04/06/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

03/31/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

03/25/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

03/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/27/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/20/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/18/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/18/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/18/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020092925 Book: 7855 Page: 2365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Daniel Kreitler w/attch'd Motion to Adopt Stip Instrument: 2020092273 Book: 7855 Page: 147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 5/13/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 6/8/2020 at 08:30a in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To DANIEL KREITLER fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to Daniel Kreitler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Daniel Kreitler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 3/27/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 5/13/2020 at 09:00a in City Island Courthouse in COURTROOM 7, 3rd Floor, VOLUSIA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ANNEX with Kelly, Christopher.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To DANIEL KREITLER fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Daniel Kreitler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL