Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/11/2021 at 06:43:46 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. CELESTE RIVERA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CELESTE RIVERA. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CELESTE RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ILIANA HERNANDEZ

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Suite 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/06/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/31/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/15/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/15/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

03/15/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/15/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: MLZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To CELESTE RIVERA fwd to proc serv(MAX) via e service for sop, cc Ptf's Atty via e service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Celeste Rivera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC w/o prop Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNANDEZ, ILIANA