This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 13:02:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. BRETT LAMBERT

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRETT LAMBERT. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant

BRETT LAMBERT

South Daytona, FL 32119-2151

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/26/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/26/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/02/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/07/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

HEARING SHEET

12/27/2022 : HEARING SHEET

ORDER DIRECTING

01/02/2023 : ORDER DIRECTING

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/04/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by LVNV Funding LLC Instrument: 2023005668 Book: 8355 Page: 2810 View: 2023005668

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: ORDER DIRECTING; Description: parties to close this matter w/i 30days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Brett Lambert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To BRETT LAMBERT fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Brett Lambert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM