Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 21:09:55 (UTC).

LUIS R ALBELO V. IDALINA R ALBELO

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 LUIS R ALBELO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against IDALINA R ALBELO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stasia Warren and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stasia Warren

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioners

IDALINA R ALBELO

LUIS R ALBELO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: AAZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: permission Idalina R Albelo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: permission Luis R Albelo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: simplified dissolutions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: as to both parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less