This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:36:30 (UTC).

LOWRY CHIROPRACTIC LLC DBA SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC & CAR INJURY CLINIC PATIENT CHARLES WUESTHOFF V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 LOWRY CHIROPRACTIC LLC DBA SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC CAR INJURY CLINIC PATIENT CHARLES WUESTHOFF filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOWRY CHIROPRACTIC LLC DBA SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC & CAR INJURY CLINIC PATIENT CHARLES WUESTHOFF

SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC & CAR INJURY CLINIC

CHARLES WUESTHOFF

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL R PRINCE

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

AUTUMN LESTER

Andrews Biernacki Davis, 390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/10/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/10/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/13/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/04/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

01/12/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/18/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/18/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Lowry Chiropractic LLC etc Instrument: 2023015539 Book: 8360 Page: 2720 View: 2023015539

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to file response to complaint by Progressive American Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Autumn Lester obo Progressive AMerican Ins Co w/designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO State of Florida obo Progressive American Insurance Company emailed 12-13-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive American Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less