Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 21:01:54 (UTC).

LORI LYNN DUNN V. DANIEL GEORGE DUNN

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 LORI LYNN DUNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL GEORGE DUNN. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LORI LYNN DUNN

Respondent

DANIEL GEORGE DUNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TONYA D CROMARTIE

648 S Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Respondent Attorney

PHILIP BONAMO

222 Seabreeze Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: SHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 295.00; Final Amount: 295.00; Credits: -295.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: INTERROGATORIES; Description: to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: by respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COUNTER CLAIM / PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: by respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: by atty Philip J Bonamo obo resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To DANIEL GEORGE DUNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by atty **issued**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less