This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 19:05:45 (UTC).

LOANCARE LLC V. DANIEL C BAER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 LOANCARE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DANIEL C BAER,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOANCARE LLC

TIFFANY & BOSCO PA

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DANIEL C BAER

Orlando, FL 32810

MATTHEW J WHITE

Port Orange, FL 32129

ASHLEY L BARTMAN

Daytona, FL 32119

DANIEL CASEY

Port Orange, FL 32129

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

Port Orange, FL 32129

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

Port Orange, FL 32129

SPRINGWOOD VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Palm Coast, FL 32137

VOLUSIA COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

Deland, FL 32724

WALTER H THOMAS

Lisbon, OH 44432

UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF WALTER H THOMAS

Lisbon, OH 44432

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

FRANK S GANZ

Smith Bigman Brock, Po Box 15200

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

ANTONIO JAIMES

101 N Alabama Ave

Deland, FL 32721

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/14/2023 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/08/2023 : REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/08/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/06/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

01/30/2023 : ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

01/12/2023 : MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

12/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

11/28/2022 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

07/21/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/21/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

07/21/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

07/21/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: as to FIRST AMENDED complaint To UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF WALTER H. THOMAS forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45.5); Docket Type: REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: LoanCare LLC to Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Springwood Village Homeowners Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Amended Complaint to Unknown Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter H Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (as to Amd Complaint)Springwood Village Homeowenrs Association Inc w/affirm defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43); Docket Type: ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION; Description: the Amended Complaint is deemed filed (see doc #42), pltf shall have 120days for service of process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION; Description: by LoanCare LLC dropping unknown party in possession #1 and #1 and Walter H Thomas; adding unknown personal representative of the estate of Walter H Thomas att'd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Walter H Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Mtthew J White

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: (Amd) pltf shall have 60 days to perfect service on any unserved dfts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Party In Possession #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Daniel Casey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ashley J Bartman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Matthew J White

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Daniel C Baer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022175634 Book: 8289 Page: 2093 View: 2022175634

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less