This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 04:24:01 (UTC).

LISA L GREUBEL V. JOHN SHANKS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 LISA L GREUBEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN SHANKS,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA L GREUBEL

Defendants

JOHN SHANKS

Daytona Bch Shores, FL 32118

SHEILA KROHN

Daytona Bch Shores, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY E HUGHES

900 Big Tree Road

South Daytona, FL 32119

Defendant Attorney

JERRY B WELLS

127 Magnolia Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

12/22/2022 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

12/22/2022 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

12/22/2022 : NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

12/09/2022 : NOTICE OF FILING

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

12/07/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/02/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

11/29/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

11/29/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/29/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/14/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/14/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/14/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/14/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/07/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/07/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/07/2022 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

11/07/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/07/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: iss'd, Fwd to Pltf @ Frnt Ctr for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst John Shanks and Sheila Krohn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: copy of letters of administration by John Shanks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: John Shanks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: John Shanks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answer to complaint by Sheila Krohn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Sheila Krohn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: CORRECTED to John Shanks rtn to Pltf's Atty by mail/e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to SHEILA KROHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SHEILA KROHN rtn to Pltf's Atty by mail/e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to JOHN SHANKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JOHN SHANKS rtn to Pltf's Atty by mail/e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: John Shanks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Sheila Krohn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Lisa L Greubel of Related cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less