This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 11:25:31 (UTC).

LISA L GREUBEL V. CHARLES R REEVES

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 LISA L GREUBEL filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHARLES R REEVES. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA L GREUBEL

Defendant

CHARLES R REEVES

Daytona Bch Shores, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY E HUGHES

900 Big Tree Road

South Daytona, FL 32119

Defendant Attorney

JERRY B WELLS

127 Magnolia Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

WORKSHEET

09/30/2021 : WORKSHEET

SUGGESTION OF DEATH

10/21/2022 : SUGGESTION OF DEATH

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

01/05/2023 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

01/04/2023 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/06/2022 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

09/26/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/27/2022 : MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/30/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

ORDER DIRECTING

09/10/2022 : ORDER DIRECTING

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Mary G. Jolley; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Mary G. Jolley; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Mary G. Jolley; Location: CI304, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36); Docket Type: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; Description: Herbert S Zischkau III obo Charles R Reeves

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35); Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: Trial and setting CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34); Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: Trial by Lisa L Greubel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33); Docket Type: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Description: as counsel for Dfnt by Herbert S Zischkau III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32); Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Lisa Greubel for access to real property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31); Docket Type: SUGGESTION OF DEATH; Description: as to Charles Richard Reeves

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: NJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE; Description: by Charles R Reeves

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Charles R Reeves

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CHARLES R REEVES rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Lisa L Greubel of filing fee payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Charles R Reeves

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT TO PARTITION PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JERRY B WELLS