This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/01/2022 at 03:42:47 (UTC).

LAURA E ROTH, ETC. V. JOSEPH WILLIAM CORNECK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 LAURA E ROTH, ETC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH WILLIAM CORNECK,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURA E ROTH

Defendants

JOSEPH WILLIAM CORNECK

Orange City, FL 32763

JAMES PHILIP JONES II

Orange City, FL 32763

ALEXIS PAIGE JONES

Orange City, FL 32763

MORTGAGE ELECTONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Jacksonville, FL 32202

HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK

Plantation, FL 33324

STERNS LENDING LLC MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ELIZABETH IANNOLINO

Deland, FL 32724

STEARNS LENDING LLC MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COREN J MEEKS

311 East Rich Ave

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorneys

CHAD D HECKMAN

Po Box 12492

Tallahassee, FL 32317

STACY A ECKERT

Attorney at STACY A ECKERT P A

2445 S Volusia Ave C-1

Orange City, FL 32763

MATTHEW CICCIO

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

11/16/2022 : ORDER GRANTING

HEARING SHEET

11/07/2022 : HEARING SHEET

COPY OF LETTER

08/29/2022 : COPY OF LETTER

DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/31/2022 : DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/14/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

09/08/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/05/2022 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

COPY OF LETTER

04/19/2022 : COPY OF LETTER

DEFAULT

04/19/2022 : DEFAULT

COPY OF LETTER

04/19/2022 : COPY OF LETTER

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

03/04/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/10/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/04/2022 : REQUEST BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/29/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

FORTY DAY (ST. OF FLA.) SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : FORTY DAY (ST. OF FLA.) SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

11/12/2021 : COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56); Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: interpleader & fees/costs **SEE ORDER** Instrument: 2022258180 Book: 8336 Page: 3137 View: 2022258180

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Pltf's Mtn to Disburse Funds in Registry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • Docket(#54); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Stacy A Eckert Esq obo Elizabeth Iannolino

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#52); Docket Type: MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: funds by Laura E Roth Clerk of the Court Volusia County Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51); Docket Type: DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Stearns Lending LLC/Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#50); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: and fees by Antonio James obo Laura E Roth, etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49); Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Coren J Meeks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docket(#48); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Matthew Ciccio Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FORTY DAY (ST. OF FLA.) SUMMONS; Description: To INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To STERNS LENDING LLC fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALEXIS PAIGE JONES fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JAMES PHILIP JONES II fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JOSEPH WILLIAM CORNECK fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 2.50; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Joseph William Corneck et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT; Description: for Interpleader

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less