Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2020 at 12:39:49 (UTC).

LAKE MARY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER P A, ETC. V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 LAKE MARY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER P A, ETC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher Kelly and Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christopher Kelly

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLY GONZALEZ

SIMOES DAVILA

LAKE MARY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER P A

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JULIO DAVID DAVILA

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

2170 W State Rd 434 Ste 450

Longwood, FL 32779

MICHELLE REEVES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

2170 West Sr 434 Ste 450

Longwood, FL 32779

Defendant Attorneys

BERT E UEBELE IV

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

BRIDGET J BULLIS

Progressive Pip House Counsel 901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

BRIDGET J BERTELS

Progressive Pip House Counsel 901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/15/2019 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/05/2019 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/22/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/22/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/14/2017 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/06/2017 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/06/2017 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/29/2017 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2017 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/02/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COPY OF LAW / CITATION

08/06/2018 : COPY OF LAW / CITATION

MEMORANDUM OF LAW / CITATION

01/19/2018 : MEMORANDUM OF LAW / CITATION

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/06/2017 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/18/2017 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

STIPULATION AND ORDER

09/28/2017 : STIPULATION AND ORDER

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/26/2017 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/28/2017 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

06/28/2017 : COMPLAINT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Progressive American Insurance Co to 4th Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: 4th to Progressive Select Ins Co by Lake Mary Chiropractic Center PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Progressive American Insurance Company to 3rd req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd) to Progressive American Insurance Company by Lake Mary Chiropractic Center PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Bridget J Bullis Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Bridget J Bullis Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of atty w/in firm to Bridget Bullis Esq obo Progressive American Insurance & Designation of email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Progressive American Insurance Company to req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (2nd)to Progressive American Insurance Company by Lake Mary Chiropractic Center,P.A.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: COPY OF LAW / CITATION; Description: (supp) by Lake Mary Chiropractic Center PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: STIPULATION AND ORDER; Description: from Small Claims Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer State of Florida obo Progressive American Insurance Company emailed 08-25-2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE MARY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERTELS, BRIDGET J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BULLIS BRIDGET J