Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/17/2020 at 11:30:19 (UTC).

LAKE HARNEY WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, ETC. V. LARRY L MOORE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 LAKE HARNEY WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, ETC filed an Other lawsuit against LARRY L MOORE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher Kelly and Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christopher Kelly

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAKE HARNEY WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

DHN ATTORNEY PA

Defendant

LARRY L MOORE

Not Classified By Court

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN FONG

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL D TEMPKINS

1947 Lee Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789-1834

 

Court Documents

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

10/24/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/14/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/03/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/03/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/01/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/26/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/26/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/23/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/23/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

WORKSHEET

09/23/2019 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/23/2019 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

09/23/2019 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: All Ukn Tenants/Owners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: & email designation by Michael D Tempkins obo Larry L Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Larry L Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Lake Harney Wood Property Owners Association w/no prop Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LARRY L MOORE fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to All Unknown Tenants/Owners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Larry L Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: (Lien Foreclosure Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2019190079 Book: 7752 Page: 2060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN; Description: (Assessments)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tempkins, Michael D