This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/20/2020 at 03:50:02 (UTC).

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION V. YAN CHEN, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YAN CHEN, ETC . This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L DI MASI PA

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

YAN CHEN

Not Classified By Court

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YAN CHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN L DIMASI

Law Offices Of John L Di Masi 801 N Orange Ave Ste 500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/05/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

08/05/2020 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/05/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

08/05/2020 : WORKSHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/05/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/05/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/05/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/10/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/10/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/10/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/18/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/19/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/02/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/11/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/11/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Yan Chen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Unkn Spouse of Yan Chen nka Alan Chen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: All Unknown Tenants/Owners N/K/A Alexandra Isaza

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Lake Baton Estates Homeowners Association Inc, etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YAN CHEN fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To YAN CHEN, INDIVIDUALLY fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to All Unknown Tenants/Owners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Yan Chen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Yan Chen, Individual

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: (Valuation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2020146825 Book: 7892 Page: 270

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN; Description: Assessments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less