This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/31/2020 at 02:42:53 (UTC).

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION V. WAYLON TYLER POITEVINT, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WAYLON TYLER POITEVINT, ETC . This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L DI MASI P A

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

DANA MARIE POITEVINT

WAYLON TYLER POITEVINT

Not Classified By Court

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN L DIMASI

Law Offices Of John L Di Masi 801 N Orange Ave Ste 500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/10/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/10/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/11/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/11/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

03/02/2020 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

03/02/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/02/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/02/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/12/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/11/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/11/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/11/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/11/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

WORKSHEET

02/06/2020 : WORKSHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/03/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/out prej by Lake Baton Estates etc Instrument: 2020105644 Book: 7863 Page: 4605

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (copy)Waylon Poitevint & Dana Poitvint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Waylon Poitevint & Dana Poitvint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: All Unk tenants/owners Instrument: 2020046814 Book: 7824 Page: 2817

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unk tenants/owners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Waylon Tyler Poitevint (NOT orig summons clerk issued)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Dana Marie Poitevint (NOT orig summons clerk issued)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Lake Baton Estates Homeowners Assoc (no order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to All Unknown Tenants/Owners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Dana Marie Poitevint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Waylon Tyler Poitevint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2020025349 Book: 7810 Page: 4142

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN; Description: for maintenance fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: $2,689.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less