This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/19/2020 at 08:05:58 (UTC).

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION V. SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ VIERA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ VIERA. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L DI MASI PA

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ VIERA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ

Not Classified By Court

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN L DIMASI

Law Offices Of John L Di Masi 801 N Orange Ave Ste 500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

04/16/2020 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/16/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

04/16/2020 : WORKSHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/09/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/09/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/09/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

07/28/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

07/29/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/31/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: FINAL Instrument: 2020140655 Book: 7887 Page: 4304

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Joint Stipulation for Resolution by Lake Baton Estates Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ VIERA fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to SANDRA MICHELLE HERNANDEZ VIERA fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to All unknown tenants/owners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Unk spouse of Sandra Michelle Hernandez Viera

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Sandra Michelle Hernandez Viera

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2020077604 Book: 7845 Page: 2143

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN; Description: maintenance fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less