This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/14/2022 at 21:08:52 (UTC).

LAK CAPITAL AT OSPREY LANDING LLC V. LONNA MATASKA

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 LAK CAPITAL AT OSPREY LANDING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LONNA MATASKA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAK CAPITAL AT OSPREY LANDING LLC

EDWARDS & EDWARDS P A

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant

LONNA MATASKA

Daytona Beach, FL 32119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGHAN E EDWARDS

Attorney at EDWARDS & EDWARDS P A

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

09/28/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/28/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PROPOSED

09/28/2021 : PROPOSED

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

09/29/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/29/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/08/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

10/14/2021 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

10/14/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

10/18/2021 : DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/18/2021 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

10/19/2021 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/21/2021 : REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

10/21/2021 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

10/27/2021 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

MAIL RETURNED FROM

12/21/2021 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Lonna Mataska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec to Lonna Mataska by posting; turned over to Bryan Biehle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: issd, fwd to VSO w/$90.00ck for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; Description: by Lak Capital at Osprey Landing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Lonna Mataska& $200costs Instrument: 2021251640 Book: 8139 Page: 4814

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Lonna Mataska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Lonna Mataska w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Lak Capital at Osprey Landing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Lonna Mataska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to LONNA MATASKA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LONNA MATASKA rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PROPOSED; Description: certificate of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Lonna Mataska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAK CAPITAL AT OSPREY LANDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EDWARDS & EDWARDS P A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth