Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 00:03:57 (UTC).

KIMBERLY M PEREZ V. GERARD S TURNER

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 KIMBERLY M PEREZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GERARD S TURNER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMBERLY M PEREZ

Respondent

GERARD S TURNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: final (30 min)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF HEARING; Description: amended by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF HEARING; Description: by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: COPY; Description: of lab test from Lab Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: permission Kimberly M Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Gerard Turner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Kimberly M Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: Kimberly M Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less