This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/31/2022 at 05:23:28 (UTC).

KIMBERLY ANNE MCCARGO V. ANDREW J CERIO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 KIMBERLY ANNE MCCARGO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANDREW J CERIO,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIMBERLY ANNE MCCARGO

CLEMENTS LAW P A

Deland, FL 32720

Defendants

ANDREW J CERIO

Deleon Springs, FL 32130

ANY UNKNOWN SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER

Deleon Springs, FL 32130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID H CLEMENTS

540 West New York Avenue

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER J KOLLMER

Attorney at PETERSON LAW GROUP PLLC

418 Canal Street

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

12/07/2022 : CERTIFICATE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

10/26/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/24/2022 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

10/06/2022 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/06/2022 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/18/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

06/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION TO STRIKE

06/03/2022 : MOTION TO STRIKE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/03/2022 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/16/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/16/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

05/16/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

05/10/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/29/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/08/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/07/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE; Description: of business Records by Julia Hewitt obo City of Deland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: exec subp Kimberly Anne Mccargo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Kimberly Anne Mccargo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to City of DeLand Utilities Dept

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Andrew J Cerio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of verified answers to 1st set of interrogs by Andrew J Cerio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Any Unk Spouse Heirs etc nka Judy Cerio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: affirm defenses by Kimberly Ann McCargo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by Kimberly McCargo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Andrew J Cerio by Kimberly Ann McCargo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANDREW J. CERIO w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Andrew Cerio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022082672 Book: 8234 Page: 852 View: 2022082672

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: *No Claim Amount*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER J KOLLMER