Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/21/2020 at 00:00:27 (UTC).

KACIA A DRYDEN, ET AL V. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA, ETC.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 KACIA A DRYDEN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA, ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATION LAW FIRM LLP

KACIA A DRYDEN

ELAINE LEE

MORGAN & MORGAN PA

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAMMY HAMMACK-BARBER

Attorney at NATION LAW FIRM LLP

570 Crown Oak Centre Drive

Longwood, FL 32750

LOGAN TEMPLETON

Attorney at THE NATION LAW FIRM LLP

570 Crown Oak Centre Drive

Longwood, FL 32750

Defendant Attorneys

JOCELYN DOPSON RODRIGUEZ

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Tower Place Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

CHRISTOPHER M DEGROTTOLE

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE PA

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/19/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

07/30/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/22/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL

07/20/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/27/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

02/10/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/21/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

01/03/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE

11/18/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/24/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO QUASH

10/23/2019 : MOTION TO QUASH

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

10/04/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/17/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/17/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

09/17/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: deft's motion to quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Kacia A Dryden & Elanie Lee to dfnt mtn for protective order agst pltf req tod depose dfnt corp rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: privilege Log by Kacia A Dryden & Elanie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answers to interrogs by Kacia A Dryden & Elanie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Kacia A Dryden & Elanie Lee to req to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: (cross)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: MOTION TO VACATE / VACATING; Description: dfts mtn to deem admissions admitted by Kacia A Dryden et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Kacia A Dryden et al to req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First to deem admissions admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company DBA Security First Florida fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company DBA Security First Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Security First Insurance Company DBA Security First Florida by Kacia A Dryden and Elaine Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company DBA Security First Florida by Kacia A Dryden and Elaine Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Security First Insurance Company DBA Security First Florida by Kacia A Dryden and Elaine Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Tammy Hammack-Barber, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Correspondence w/attached by Security First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATION LAW FIRM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN & MORGAN PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMACK-BARBER , TAMMY