Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 21:14:05 (UTC).

JULES DELGADO V. ARIANA R DELGADO

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 JULES DELGADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARIANA R DELGADO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JULES DELGADO

Respondent

ARIANA R DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN DELAROCHE

1005 S Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Respondent Attorney

JAMES R EVANS

Attorney at JAMES R EVANS P A

444 Seabreeze Blvd Ste 360

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: SHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: and designation of email by James Evans obo respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: return of service on rsp 03/03/2021 by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage w/no Children or Property To ARIANA R DELGADO **e-served to atty for service on resp**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by atty **issued**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/atch copy of FLDL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVEN DELAROCHE