Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/26/2020 at 22:24:17 (UTC).

JUDITH FULTON, ET AL V. FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 JUDITH FULTON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATION LAW FIRM LLP

JUDITH FULTON

WINSTON FULTON

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDUARDO J FARIA

Attorney at THE NATION LAW FIRM LLP

570 Crown Oak Centre Drive

Longwood, FL 32750

THOMAS E N SHEA

Attorney at THE NATION LAW FIRM LLP

570 Crown Oak Centre Drive

Longwood, FL 32750

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN J SMITH

Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Cohen 729 S W Federal Hwy Ste 222

Stuart, FL 34994

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/11/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/23/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/09/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

07/01/2020 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

05/21/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/23/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

04/23/2020 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

04/08/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/16/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

02/25/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/21/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/18/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/18/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/18/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/18/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Judith Fulton et al of privilege log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by Judith Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Judith Fulton et al to req to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: response to discovery requests by Judith Fulton and Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to interrogs and req to produce by Judith Fulton et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Judith Fulton & Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Lauren J Smith,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Judith and Winston Fulton by Fednat Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Winston Fulton by Fednat Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to Fednat Insurance Company fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Fednat Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Correspondence by Judith Fulton and Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Fednat Insurance Company by Judith Fulton and Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Fednat Insurance Company by Judith Fulton and Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Fednat Insurance Company by Judith Fulton and Winston Fulton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Eduardo J Faria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATION LAW FIRM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faria, Eduardo Julian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA THOMAS E N