Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/07/2020 at 18:16:06 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE ARMSTRONG V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JOSEPHINE ARMSTRONG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPHINE ARMSTRONG

POLITIS & MATOVINA PA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK A MATOVINA

Attorney at POLITIS & MATOVINA PA

730 Dunlawton Avenue

Port Orange, FL 32127

Defendant Attorney

JOHN KNUTTON

111 North Orange Avenue Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT

06/30/2020 : ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/24/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

06/16/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TO SIGN OR SETTLE

05/26/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TO SIGN OR SETTLE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/21/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/26/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/26/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/23/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/17/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

03/11/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

03/02/2020 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/24/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

02/21/2020 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/19/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/19/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

02/06/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

01/27/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Josephine Armstrong Instrument: 2020166892 Book: 7905 Page: 2748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Geico General Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Co to Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: proposal for settlement by Josephine Armstrong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: (supp) Josephine Armstrong to req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TO SIGN OR SETTLE; Description: by Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd) to GEICO General Insurance Company by Josephine Armstrong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Envision Physical Therapy et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: Amended Interrogatory Answers to Interrogs by Josephine Armstrong

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: John Knutton obo Geico and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico of disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Ins Co w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLITIS & MATOVINA PA is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN KNUTTON