This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/16/2020 at 13:52:35 (UTC).

JOSEPH SCHMIDT V. KIRK MARTIN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 JOSEPH SCHMIDT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KIRK MARTIN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH SCHMIDT

MORGAN & MORGAN PA

Defendants

SANDY L MARTIN

KIRK MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RYAN P RUDD

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

MARY K MORAN

20 N. Orange Avenue Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

BRANDY D ROOD

Law Offices Of Wilkerson & Rood 505 E New York Ave Ste 9

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO/FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EXAM.

11/09/2020 : REQUEST TO/FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EXAM.

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/29/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/12/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/05/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO COMPEL

08/05/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/17/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/17/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/13/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/13/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/13/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/18/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/26/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/21/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/21/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/16/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/16/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/16/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: 4A, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Docket Type: REQUEST TO/FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EXAM.; Description: of Joseph Schmidt by Kirk Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Apple Health et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Kirk Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (video) Kirk Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Joseph Schmidt to dfnt's ntc of production dtd 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Description: of docs pursuant to notice of production from non party dtd 09-22-2020 by Kirk Martin et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to T-Mobile/Metro PCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Walmart HIPAA et al

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Kirk Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Sandy L Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Kirk Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Sandy L Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Kirk Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Sandy L Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Kirk Martin by Joseph Schmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Ryan P Rudd of Joseph Schmidt and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORGAN & MORGAN PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROOD BRANDY D