This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/14/2020 at 13:08:44 (UTC).

JOSEPH PAWLAK, ETC., ET AL V. SYLVESTER DEIMLER, ET AL, ETC.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 JOSEPH PAWLAK, ETC , filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SYLVESTER DEIMLER, , ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHERYL PAWLAK

JOSEPH PAWLAK

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

Defendants

CAROLYN DEIMLER

SYLVESTER DEIMLER

KOI TO THE WORLD INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARLAN L PAUL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/25/2020 : COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/25/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/25/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/28/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/28/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/28/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

10/14/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/14/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/14/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/20/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Harlan L Paul Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Joseph Pawlak etc et al by Sylvester Deimler et al & req for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Sylvester Deimler & Carolyn Deimler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: of summons exec to Sylvester Deimier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KOI TO THE WORLD INC, A FLORIDA CORPORATION Fwd to Pltfs Atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CAROLYN DEIMLER Fwd to Pltfs Atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SYLVESTER DEIMLER Fwd to Pltfs Atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Sylvester Deimler et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Harlan L Paul Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less