Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/12/2020 at 17:02:11 (UTC).

JONATHAN GONZALEZ, ET AL V. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 JONATHAN GONZALEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIL GONZALEZ

MORGAN & MORGAN

JONATHAN GONZALEZ

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANGELA THOMAS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN P A

76 S Laura Street Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD L RUSSO

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1064 Greenwood Blvd Ste 212

Lake Mary, FL 32746-5419

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

10/30/2020 : ORDER GRANTING

REPLY BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/07/2020 : REPLY BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

09/04/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/03/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING

07/22/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/29/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

05/28/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/20/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF INSPECTION

03/17/2020 : NOTICE OF INSPECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/03/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/03/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/03/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/03/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

01/27/2020 : ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

01/20/2020 : MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/02/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

01/02/2020 : COMPLAINT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: dfnt's amd mtn to preserve evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (4th amd) American Honda Motor Co Inc of vehicle inspection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Jonathan Gonzalez to 2nd reqs for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: dfts mtn to perserve evidence/pltfs response to dfts mtn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: NOTICE OF INSPECTION; Description: (amd) of vehicle to Jonathan Gonzalez et al by American Honda Motor Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: REPLY BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Honda Motor Co Inc to pltfs response to mtn to preserve evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (amd) American Honda Motor Co Inc to preserve evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW; Description: mtn to preserve evidence by American Honda Motor Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: (amd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to American Honda Motor Co. Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to American Honda Motor Co. Inc. by Jonathan Gonzalez et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to American Honda Motor Co. Inc. by Jonathan Gonzalez et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to American Honda Motor Co. Inc. by Jonathan Gonzalez et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN & MORGAN PA is a litigant