This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/14/2022 at 21:08:39 (UTC).

JOHN SOULE, ET AL V. JAMIE STILTNER

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 JOHN SOULE, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMIE STILTNER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN SOULE

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

SUSAN HEADLEY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JAMIE STILTNER

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

11/01/2021 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

10/22/2021 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

10/20/2021 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

DEFAULT

10/20/2021 : DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/18/2021 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

10/18/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/07/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

10/05/2021 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

10/05/2021 : CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/05/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

09/28/2021 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

09/28/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/28/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

09/28/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

09/28/2021 : INFORMATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/29/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

09/29/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec,turned over to John Soule

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: iss'd & fwd to pltf frt ctr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: (Default)agst Jamie Stiltner,$235.00cc Instrument: 2021252313 Book: 8140 Page: 1876

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Jamie Stiltner by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Jamie Stiltner (Clerk cannot default answer filed on 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: James Stiltner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: no further action may be taken

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Description: of ans filed, no pymt & req for hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: & request for hearing by Jamie Stiltner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to JAMIE STILTNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JAMIE STILTNER Rtn to daytona civil for pltf pick up for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: John Soule, Susan Headley for case closure after 90 days of inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: As to Jamie Stiltner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: By John Soule

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less