This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/21/2022 at 12:37:23 (UTC).

JOHN EGNER V. NICOLE MAHONEY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 JOHN EGNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICOLE MAHONEY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN EGNER

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

NICOLE MAHONEY

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION SHEET

04/22/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/22/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

04/22/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/22/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/22/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/22/2022 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/22/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/22/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/29/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

05/10/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

05/10/2022 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

05/10/2022 : DEFAULT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

05/11/2022 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

05/12/2022 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/13/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

05/19/2022 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec, turned over to William Crow/Agent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: issd, fwd to VSO w/$90.00 ck for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: (Default)agst Nicole Mahoney,$328.50cc Instrument: 2022115631 Book: 8253 Page: 4466 View: 2022115631

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Nicole Mahoney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by John Egner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Nicole Mahoney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Nicole Mahoney/5 day/Individual

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to NICOLE MAHONEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To NICOLE MAHONEY fwd to VSO w/ ck #1033 for $40.00 for SOP cc pltf via eservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: John Egner for case closure after 90 days of inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by John Egner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Nicole Mahoney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less