This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 13:18:22 (UTC).

JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS PATIENT JOSEPH NEVILLE V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS PATIENT JOSEPH NEVILLE filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS PATIENT JOSEPH NEVILLE

SPINAL INJURY CENTERS

JOSEPH NEVILLE

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

MICHAEL R PRINCE

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/12/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/30/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO State of Florida obo Progressive American Insurance Company emailed 05-24-2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive American Ins CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP, LLC D/B/A SPINAL INJURY CENTERS AS ASSIGNEE DONISHA SOLOMON is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant