This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 20:49:33 (UTC).

JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC DBA COASTAL HEALTH GROUP PATIENT MAYRA SANABRIA GARCI V. INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC DBA COASTAL HEALTH GROUP PATIENT MAYRA SANABRIA GARCI filed an Other lawsuit against INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC DBA COASTAL HEALTH GROUP PATIENT MAYRA SANABRIA GARCI

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP

MAYRA SANABRIA GARCI

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

LAKEISHA HAYLING

Law Office Of Gabriel O Fundora & Associates, 506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/17/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/05/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/07/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/22/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO STRIKE

05/11/2022 : MOTION TO STRIKE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/11/2022 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: UJZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Visiting Judge; Location: UJZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by JM JZ Enterprises Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: Affirm Defenses by JM JZ Enterprises Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Infinity Insurance Co w/affirm defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of LaKeisha J Haling obo Infinity Ins Co w/designation, demand for jury trial and request to cancel PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Infinity Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Infinity Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant